There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Charles Duncan Buried with Honor Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Charles Duncan Buried with Honor Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Charles Duncan Buried with Honor Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Charles Duncan Buried with Honor Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish caskets and urns for burial in cemeteries of States and tribal organizations of veterans without next of kin or sufficient resources to provide for caskets or urns, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-273. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/08/2016Presented to President.
12/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7246-7247)
09/20/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5911)
09/20/2016Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/20/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-273. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/08/2016SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2016-3:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2016-3:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7246-7247)
12/06/2016-3:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3076.
12/06/2016-3:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7246-7247)
12/06/2016-3:45pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/26/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/21/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/21/2016-12:41pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/21/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/20/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5911)
09/20/2016SenateS.Amdt.5081 Amendment SA 5081 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2016SenateS.Amdt.5081 Amendment SA 5081 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator Blumenthal. (consideration: CR S5911; text: CR S5911) To make a technical correction.
09/20/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5911)
09/20/2016SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/29/2016SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-707.
06/20/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/12/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/20/2016 Referred to
06/29/2016 Hearings by
09/20/2016 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs09/21/2016 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs09/26/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-273 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 20, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Charles Duncan Buried with Honor Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), if it is unable to identify a deceased veteran's next of kin and if it determines that sufficient resources for the furnishing of a casket or urn for the burial of such veteran are not otherwise available, to furnish a casket or urn for the burial of such veteran in a national cemetery (current law) or in a veterans cemetery of a state or tribal organization for which the VA has provided a grant for the establishment, expansion, and improvement of veterans' cemeteries.