Summary: S.3088 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/15/2016)

(Sec. 1) This bill revises the requirements of the U.S. Coast Guard's alternate safety compliance program for certain fishing vessels.

Specifically, the bill delays the date when vessels must comply with the program. Vessels must comply by the later of January 1, 2021, or the end of the three-year period after the Coast Guard issues a final rule establishing the program. The bill also requires vessels that are built before July 1, 2012, to comply with the program. Currently, vessels built before July 1, 2013, must comply. Additionally, a vessel built before July 1, 2012 that undergoes a major conversion after such date must comply with the program.

If the requirements of the program change after establishment, the Coast Guard must provide at least a three-year grace period for vessels to be in compliance with such requirements.

(Sec. 2) The Coast Guard must: (1) publish and disseminate a policy to standardize coordination, outreach, and design of the alternate safety compliance program; and (2) publish a public memorandum for the fishing, shipbuilding, and maritime industry and the public including guidance, timelines, and opportunities for public engagement.

(Sec. 4) The Coast Guard must report to Congress by June 1, 2018, on the progress of the design and implementation of the alternate safety compliance program.