There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Dangerous Sanctuary Cities Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure that State and local law enforcement may cooperate with Federal officials to protect our communities from violent criminals and suspected terrorists who are illegally present in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
07/06/2016Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 119. (consideration: CR S4798-4799; text: CR S4799)
Action By: Senate
07/06/2016Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S4779-4794; text: CR S4779)
Action By: Senate
06/29/2016Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S4702)
Action By: Senate
06/29/2016Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S4702; text: CR S4702)
Action By: Senate
06/29/2016Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S4702; text: CR S4702)
Action By: Senate
06/28/2016Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 531.
Action By: Senate
06/27/2016Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4583-4585)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/28/2016
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/06/2016
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/06/2016
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 07/06/2016
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 07/06/2016
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/06/2016
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/06/2016

Committees (0)

As of 08/25/2019 text has not been received for S.3100 - Stop Dangerous Sanctuary Cities Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3100. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/27/2016)

Stop Dangerous Sanctuary Cities Act

This bill prohibits a sanctuary jurisdiction from receiving grants under certain Economic Development Assistance Programs and the Community Development Block Grant Program. A sanctuary jurisdiction is a state or political subdivision that has a statute, policy, or practice in effect that prohibits or restricts: (1) information sharing about an individual's immigration status, or (2) compliance with a lawfully issued detainer request or notification of release request.

A state or political subdivision that complies with a detainer is deemed to be an agent of the Department of Homeland Security and is authorized to take actions to comply with the detainer.

The bill limits the liability of a state or political subdivision, or an officer or employee of such state or political subdivision, for actions in compliance with the detainer.