There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

BOTS Act of 2016
Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BOTS Act of 2016
Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BOTS Act of 2016
Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

BOTS Act of 2016
Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

BOTS Act of 2016
Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the circumvention of control measures used by Internet ticket sellers to ensure equitable consumer access to tickets for any given event, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/14/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-274. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016 Signed by President.
12/12/2016 Presented to President.
12/07/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
12/05/2016 By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-391.
11/30/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2016 Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/13/2016 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/14/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-274. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016 Signed by President.
12/12/2016 Senate Presented to President.
12/07/2016-5:28pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2016-5:28pm House On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7326-7327)
12/07/2016-5:26pm House Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7326-7327)
12/07/2016-5:26pm House Mrs. Blackburn asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
12/05/2016 Senate By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-391.
12/01/2016-3:17pm House Held at the desk.
12/01/2016-12:23pm House Received in the House.
12/01/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2016 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6626-6627; text as passed Senate: CR S6626-6627)
09/27/2016 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 648.
09/27/2016 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation
09/21/2016 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation
09/13/2016 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Senate Subcommittee on Consumer Protection, Product Safety, Insurance, and Data Security. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-614.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Consumer Protection, Product Safety, Insurance, and Data Security
07/13/2016 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/13/2016 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
09/27/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-391
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Consumer Protection, Product Safety, Insurance, and Data Security09/13/2016 Hearings by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Competition and antitrust
  • Computers and information technology
  • Consumer affairs
  • Internet and video services
  • Retail and wholesale trades

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3183. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-274 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on September 27, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Better Online Ticket Sales Act of 2016 or the BOTS Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the circumvention of a security measure, access control system, or other technological measure on an Internet website or online service of a ticket issuer that is used to enforce posted event ticket purchasing limits or to maintain the integrity of posted online ticket purchasing order rules for a public event with an attendance capacity exceeding 200 persons.

The bill also prohibits the sale of or offers to sell an event ticket in interstate commerce obtained through such a circumvention violation if the seller participated in, had the ability to control, or should have known about the violation.

It shall not be unlawful, however, to create or use software or systems to: (1) investigate, or further the enforcement or defense of, alleged violations; or (2) identify and analyze flaws and vulnerabilities of security measures to advance the state of knowledge in the field of computer system security or to assist in the development of computer security products.

Violations shall be treated as unfair or deceptive acts or practices under the Federal Trade Commission Act.

The bill provides authority to the Federal Trade Commission and states to enforce against such violations.