Text: S.3475 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/17/2016)


114th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. 3475


To delay the amendments to rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

November 17, 2016

Mr. Coons (for himself, Mr. Daines, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Lee, Mr. Franken, Ms. Baldwin, and Mr. Paul) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary


A BILL

To delay the amendments to rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Review the Rule Act of 2016”.

SEC. 2. Criminal procedure rules.

(a) In general.—Notwithstanding the order entered by the Supreme Court of the United States on April 28, 2016—

(1) effective on the date of enactment of this Act, rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure is amended to read as it read on November 17, 2016; and

(2) the proposed amendments to rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure set forth in such order shall take effect on July 1, 2017.

(b) Applicability.—Notwithstanding the amendment made by subsection (a)(1), for any warrant issued under rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure during the period beginning on December 1, 2016, and ending on the date of enactment of this Act, such rule 41, as was in effect on the date on which the warrant was issued, shall apply with respect to the warrant.


Share This