Text: S.3492 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-276 (12/14/2016)

 
[114th Congress Public Law 276]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 130 STAT. 1407]]

Public Law 114-276
114th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To designate the Traverse City VA Community-Based Outpatient Clinic of 
 the Department of Veterans Affairs in Traverse City, Michigan, as the 
   ``Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic''. <<NOTE: Dec. 14, 2016 -  [S. 
                                3492]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. DESIGNATION OF COLONEL DEMAS T. CRAW VA CLINIC IN 
                              TRAVERSE CITY, MICHIGAN.

    (a) Findings.--Congress finds the following:
            (1) Demas T. Craw was born on April 9, 1900, in Long Lake 
        Township, Michigan.
            (2) While residing in Traverse City, Michigan, Demas T. Craw 
        enlisted in the United States Army at Columbus Barracks, Ohio, 
        on April 18, 1918, and trained with the 12th Cavalry at Camp 
        Stanley, Texas.
            (3) Colonel Craw achieved the position of senior pilot and 
        was awarded--
                    (A) the Medal of Honor for action in North Africa;
                    (B) the World War I Victory Medal;
                    (C) the World War II Victory Medal;
                    (D) the European-African-Middle Eastern Campaign 
                Medal;
                    (E) the Mexican Service Medal;
                    (F) the American Defense Service Medal;
                    (G) the Purple Heart;
                    (H) the Royal Order of George I; and
                    (I) the Observer Badge.
            (4) Colonel Craw's citation for the Medal of Honor said, 
        ``For conspicuous gallantry and intrepidity in action above and 
        beyond the call of duty. On November 8, 1942, near Port Lyautey, 
        French Morocco, Col. Craw volunteered to accompany the leading 
        wave of assault boats to the shore and pass through the enemy 
        lines to locate the French commander with a view to suspending 
        hostilities. This request was first refused as being too 
        dangerous but upon the officer's insistence that he was 
        qualified to undertake and accomplish the mission he was allowed 
        to go. Encountering heavy fire while in the landing boat and 
        unable to dock in the river because of shell fire from shore 
        batteries, Col. Craw, accompanied by 1 officer and 1 soldier, 
        succeeded in landing on the beach at Mehdia Plage under constant 
        low-level strafing from 3 enemy planes. Riding in a bantam truck 
        toward French headquarters, progress of the party was hindered 
        by fire from our own naval guns. Nearing Port Lyautey, Col. Craw 
        was instantly killed by a

[[Page 130 STAT. 1408]]

        sustained burst of machinegun fire at pointblank range from a 
        concealed position near the road.''.
            (5) Colonel Craw was killed in action on November 8, 1942, 
        while attempting to deliver a message to broker a cease fire 
        with France.

    (b) Designation.--The Traverse City VA Community-Based Outpatient 
Clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Traverse City, Michigan, 
shall after the date of the enactment of this Act be known and 
designated as the ``Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic''.
    (c) Reference.--Any reference in any law, regulation, map, document, 
paper, or other record of the United States to the community-based 
outpatient clinic referred to in subsection (b) shall be considered to 
be a reference to the Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic.

    Approved December 14, 2016.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3492:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 162 (2016):
            Dec. 1, considered and passed Senate.
            Dec. 6, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>