There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Senate Campaign Disclosure Parity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require Senate candidates to file designations, statements, and reports in electronic form.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/04/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/04/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/04/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 02/04/2015
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/23/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/25/2015
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/26/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/06/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/11/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/16/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/03/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/01/2016
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/18/2016
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/25/2016
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/06/2016
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/08/2016
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/20/2016
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 07/11/2016
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/13/2016
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration02/04/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.366. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/2015)

Senate Campaign Disclosure Parity Act

Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to require all election-related designations, statements, and reports required to be filed under the Act to be filed directly with the Federal Election Commission.