There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Privacy Notice Modernization Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Gramm-Leach-Bliley Act to provide an exception to the annual written privacy notice requirement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
02/12/2015Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
02/10/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/10/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/11/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/11/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 02/11/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/11/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/23/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/23/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 02/23/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/23/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/23/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/04/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/04/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/09/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/10/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/11/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/12/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/12/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/17/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 03/17/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/18/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/18/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/19/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/19/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/19/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/25/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/25/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 04/14/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/20/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/20/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/20/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/20/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/20/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/29/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/29/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/05/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/11/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/21/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/15/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/22/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/10/2015 Referred to
02/12/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.423. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/10/2015)

Privacy Notice Modernization Act of 2015

Amends the Gramm-Leach-Bliley Act to exempt from its annual written privacy policy notice requirement any financial institution which: (1) provides nonpublic personal information only in accordance with specified requirements, (2) has not changed its policies and practices with respect to disclosing nonpublic personal information from those disclosed in the most recent disclosure sent to consumers, and (3) otherwise provides customers access to such most recent disclosure in electronic or other form permitted by specified regulations.