There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet Tax Freedom Forever Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to permanently extend the Internet Tax Freedom Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/10/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/10/2015
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/10/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 02/10/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/25/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/25/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/26/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 02/27/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/09/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/16/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/04/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/13/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 07/21/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/10/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.431. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/10/2015)

Internet Tax Freedom Forever Act

Amends the Internet Tax Freedom Act to make permanent the ban on state and local taxation of Internet access and on multiple or discriminatory taxes on electronic commerce.