There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve enforcement efforts related to prescription drug diversion and abuse, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/19/2016Became Public Law No: 114-145. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2016Signed by President.
04/14/2016Presented to President.
04/12/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H1618-1619)
03/17/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1605-1606; text as passed Senate: CR S1605-1606)
02/11/2016Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/12/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/19/2016Became Public Law No: 114-145. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2016Signed by President.
04/14/2016SenatePresented to President.
04/12/2016-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/12/2016-7:02pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1618-1619)
04/12/2016-7:02pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1618-1619)
04/12/2016-7:02pmHouseMr. Lance asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
03/21/2016-4:20pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/21/2016-2:15pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/18/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/17/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1605-1606; text as passed Senate: CR S1605-1606)
02/11/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368.
02/11/2016SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/11/2016SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/12/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/12/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/17/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/24/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 04/22/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/12/2015 Referred to
02/11/2016 Markup by
02/11/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.483. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-145 (04/19/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on February 11, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to define phrases related to the Drug Enforcement Administration's (DEA's) authority to register manufacturers, distributors, and dispensers of controlled substances.

Currently, the DEA registers a controlled substances manufacturer, distributor, or dispenser if it is in the public interest after considering certain factors, including factors relevant to and consistent with the public health and safety. This bill defines "factors as may be relevant to and consistent with the public health and safety" to mean factors relevant to and consistent with the specified purposes of the Controlled Substances Act.

Additionally, current law allows the DEA to immediately suspend a registration to prevent imminent danger to the public health and safety. This bill defines "imminent danger to the public health and safety" to mean an immediate threat of death, serious bodily harm, or abuse of a controlled substance due to a registrant's failure to maintain effective controls against diversion.

The bill revises and expands the required elements of an order to show cause issued by the DEA before it denies, revokes, or suspends a registration for a Controlled Substances Act violation. An order to show cause must specifically state the legal basis for the action and notify the registrant of the opportunity to submit a corrective action plan.

(Sec. 3) The Food and Drug Administration, the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration, the Agency for Research and Quality, and the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, in coordination with the DEA, must report to Congress on:

  • obstacles to legitimate patient access to controlled substances;
  • diversion of controlled substances;
  • how collaboration between law enforcement agencies and the pharmaceutical industry can benefit patients and prevent diversion and abuse of controlled substances;
  • the availability of and gaps in medical education, training opportunities, and comprehensive clinical guidance for pain management and opioid prescribing;
  • enhancements to prescription drug monitoring programs; and
  • improvements to prescription opioid reporting requirements.