There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reduce the operation and maintenance costs associated with the Federal fleet by encouraging the use of remanufactured parts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-65. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2015Signed by President.
09/30/2015Presented to President.
09/28/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6269-6270)
06/15/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4168; text as passed Senate: CR S4168)
05/22/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 114-59.
02/25/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-65. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2015Signed by President.
09/30/2015SenatePresented to President.
09/28/2015-3:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2015-3:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6269-6270)
09/28/2015-3:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 565.
09/28/2015-3:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6269-6271)
09/28/2015-3:34pmHouseMr. Walberg moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/16/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/16/2015-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/16/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/15/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4168; text as passed Senate: CR S4168)
05/22/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 101.
05/22/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 114-59.
03/04/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/25/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 02/25/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/18/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/20/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/25/2015 Referred to
03/04/2015 Markup by
05/22/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-59
House Oversight and Government Reform06/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-65 (10/07/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Federal Vehicle Repair Cost Savings Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) Defines "remanufactured vehicle component" as a vehicle component (including an engine, transmission, alternator, starter, turbocharger, steering, or suspension component) that has been returned to same-as-new, or better, condition and performance by a standardized industrial process that incorporates technical specifications (including engineering, quality, and testing standards) to yield fully warranted products.

(Sec. 4) Directs the head of each federal agency to: (1) encourage the use of remanufactured vehicle components to maintain federal vehicles if using such components reduces the cost of maintaining such vehicles while maintaining quality; and (2) not encourage the use of remanufactured vehicle components if using such components does not reduce the cost of maintenance, lowers the quality of vehicle performance, or delays the return to service of a vehicle.