There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

LEAP Act
Leveraging and Energizing America's Apprenticeship Programs Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow employers a credit against income tax for employees who participate in qualified apprenticeship programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/25/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/25/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/24/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/15/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/30/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/07/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/21/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance02/25/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.574. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/25/2015)

Leveraging and Energizing America's Apprenticeship Programs Act or the LEAP Act

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow employers a business-related tax credit of $1,500 for hiring an apprentice who has not attained age 25 at the close of the taxable year or $1,000 for an apprentice who has attained age 25. Allows such credit for no more than two taxable years with respect to any apprentice. Defines "apprentice" as an employee who is employed in an officially-recognized apprenticeable occupation pursuant to an apprentice agreement registered with the Office of Apprenticeship of the Employment and Training Administration of the Department of Labor or a recognized state apprenticeship agency.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to coordinate with the heads of federal and independent agencies to: (1) determine which government publications could be available on government websites and no longer printed, (2) devise a strategy to reduce overall government printing costs over the 10-year period beginning with FY2015, (3) establish government-wide guidelines on employee printing, and (4) issue guidelines for publicly disclosing information about the publication of government documents.