There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Home Health Care Planning Improvement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure more timely access to home health services for Medicare beneficiaries under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/26/2015 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1163-1164)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/26/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/03/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/10/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/16/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/17/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/17/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/23/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/23/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/23/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/24/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/24/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/16/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/16/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/21/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/23/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/29/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/04/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/11/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/11/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/13/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/18/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/19/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/19/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/10/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/11/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/11/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/15/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/16/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/18/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/22/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/23/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/24/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/08/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/27/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/30/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/21/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 10/06/2015
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/03/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 11/05/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 11/19/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/01/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/10/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/23/2016
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/24/2016
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/03/2016
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/04/2016
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/05/2016
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/05/2016
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/21/2016
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/23/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/29/2016
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/26/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Home and outpatient care
  • Medicare
  • Nursing

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/26/2015)

Home Health Care Planning Improvement Act of 2015

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to revise conditions of and limitations on payment for home health care services.

Allows payment for home health services to Medicare beneficiaries by: (1) a nurse practitioner, (2) a clinical nurse specialist working in collaboration with a physician in accordance with state law, (3) a certified nurse-midwife, or (4) a physician assistant under a physician's supervision.