There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Safe Drinking Water Act to reauthorize technical assistance to small public water systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/11/2015Became Public Law No: 114-98. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2015Signed by President.
12/02/2015Presented to President.
11/30/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8418)
11/19/2015Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-346.
06/09/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3975-3976; text: CR S3975)
05/18/2015Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 114-47.
02/27/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/11/2015Became Public Law No: 114-98. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2015Signed by President.
12/02/2015SenatePresented to President.
11/30/2015-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2015-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8418)
11/30/2015-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 611.
11/30/2015-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8418-8420)
11/30/2015-4:00pmHouseMr. Shimkus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/19/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 264.
11/19/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-346.
11/18/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/18/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/17/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/28/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy
10/28/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy
10/22/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy
06/12/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/10/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/10/2015-2:34pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/10/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/09/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3975-3976; text: CR S3975)
05/18/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 83.
05/18/2015SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 114-47.
04/29/2015SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/27/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works02/27/2015 Referred to
04/29/2015 Markup by
05/18/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-47
House Energy and Commerce06/10/2015 Referred to
11/18/2015 Markup by
11/19/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-346
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy06/12/2015 Referred to
10/22/2015 Hearings by
10/28/2015 Markup by
10/28/2015 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-98 (12/11/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Grassroots Rural and Small Community Water Systems Assistance Act

(Sec. 4) This bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to reauthorize through FY2020 the Environmental Protection Agency's (EPA) program providing technical assistance to small public water systems in complying with national primary drinking water regulations.

The EPA may use the funds to provide grants or cooperative agreements to nonprofit organizations that provide onsite technical assistance; circuit-rider technical assistance programs; multistate, regional technical assistance programs; onsite and regional training; assistance with implementing source water protection plans; and assistance with implementation monitoring plans, rules, regulations, and water security enhancements. Those grants and cooperative agreements may not be used for citizen suits brought under that Act.

In order to ensure that technical assistance funding is used in a manner that is most beneficial to the small and rural communities, the EPA must give preference to nonprofit organizations that are the most qualified and experienced and that the small community water systems find to be the most beneficial and effective.