Text: S.640 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/03/2015)


114th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 640


To amend the Clean Air Act to delay the review and revision of the national ambient air quality standards for ozone.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 3, 2015

Mr. Flake (for himself, Mr. McCain, Mr. Inhofe, Mr. Wicker, Mr. Crapo, Mr. Enzi, Mr. Coats, Mr. Lee, Mr. Cornyn, and Mr. Vitter) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works


A BILL

To amend the Clean Air Act to delay the review and revision of the national ambient air quality standards for ozone.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Ozone Regulatory Delay and Extension of Assessment Length Act of 2015” or the “ORDEAL Act of 2015”.

SEC. 2. National ambient air quality standards.

Section 109(d) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7409(d)) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (1)—

(A) in the first sentence, by striking “(d)(1) Not later than December 31, 1980, and at five-year intervals” and inserting the following:

“(d) Review and revision of criteria and standards; independent scientific review committee; appointment; advisory functions.—

“(1) REVIEW AND REVISION OF CRITERIA AND STANDARDS.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in subparagraph (C), not later than December 31, 1980, and at 10-year intervals”;

(B) in the second sentence, by striking “The Administrator” and inserting the following:

“(B) EARLY AND FREQUENT REVIEW AND REVISION.—Except with respect to any national ambient air quality standard promulgated under this section for ozone concentrations, the Administrator”; and

(C) by adding at the end the following:

“(C) NATIONAL AMBIENT AIR QUALITY STANDARDS FOR OZONE CONCENTRATIONS.—Not earlier than February 1, 2018, but not later than December 31, 2018, and at 10-year intervals thereafter, the Administrator shall, with respect to national ambient air quality standards for ozone concentrations—

“(i) complete a thorough review of any standard promulgated under this section; and

“(ii) make revisions to the standards described in clause (i) and promulgate new standards as may be appropriate in accordance with section 108 and subsection (b).”; and

(2) in paragraph (2)(B)—

(A) by striking “(B) Not later than January 1, 1980, and at five-year intervals” and inserting the following:

“(B) REVIEW.—

“(i) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in clause (ii), not later than January 1, 1980, and at 10-year intervals”; and

(B) by adding at the end the following:

“(ii) NATIONAL AMBIENT AIR QUALITY STANDARDS FOR OZONE CONCENTRATIONS.—Not earlier than February 1, 2018, and at 10-year intervals thereafter, the committee referred to in subparagraph (A) shall, with respect to national ambient air quality standards for ozone concentrations—

“(I) complete a review of any standard promulgated under this section; and

“(II) recommend to the Administrator any new standard and any revision to the standards described in subclause (I) as may be appropriate under section 108 and subsection (b).”.