Text: S.640 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/03/2015)

 
[Congressional Bills 114th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. 640 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

114th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                 S. 640

  To amend the Clean Air Act to delay the review and revision of the 
           national ambient air quality standards for ozone.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             March 3, 2015

Mr. Flake (for himself, Mr. McCain, Mr. Inhofe, Mr. Wicker, Mr. Crapo, 
 Mr. Enzi, Mr. Coats, Mr. Lee, Mr. Cornyn, and Mr. Vitter) introduced 
the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee 
                    on Environment and Public Works

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
  To amend the Clean Air Act to delay the review and revision of the 
           national ambient air quality standards for ozone.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Ozone Regulatory Delay and Extension 
of Assessment Length Act of 2015'' or the ``ORDEAL Act of 2015''.

SEC. 2. NATIONAL AMBIENT AIR QUALITY STANDARDS.

    Section 109(d) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7409(d)) is 
amended--
            (1) in paragraph (1)--
                    (A) in the first sentence, by striking ``(d)(1) Not 
                later than December 31, 1980, and at five-year 
                intervals'' and inserting the following:
    ``(d) Review and Revision of Criteria and Standards; Independent 
Scientific Review Committee; Appointment; Advisory Functions.--
            ``(1) Review and revision of criteria and standards.--
                    ``(A) In general.--Except as provided in 
                subparagraph (C), not later than December 31, 1980, and 
                at 10-year intervals'';
                    (B) in the second sentence, by striking ``The 
                Administrator'' and inserting the following:
                    ``(B) Early and frequent review and revision.--
                Except with respect to any national ambient air quality 
                standard promulgated under this section for ozone 
                concentrations, the Administrator''; and
                    (C) by adding at the end the following:
                    ``(C) National ambient air quality standards for 
                ozone concentrations.--Not earlier than February 1, 
                2018, but not later than December 31, 2018, and at 10-
                year intervals thereafter, the Administrator shall, 
                with respect to national ambient air quality standards 
                for ozone concentrations--
                            ``(i) complete a thorough review of any 
                        standard promulgated under this section; and
                            ``(ii) make revisions to the standards 
                        described in clause (i) and promulgate new 
                        standards as may be appropriate in accordance 
                        with section 108 and subsection (b).''; and
            (2) in paragraph (2)(B)--
                    (A) by striking ``(B) Not later than January 1, 
                1980, and at five-year intervals'' and inserting the 
                following:
                    ``(B) Review.--
                            ``(i) In general.--Except as provided in 
                        clause (ii), not later than January 1, 1980, 
                        and at 10-year intervals''; and
                    (B) by adding at the end the following:
                            ``(ii) National ambient air quality 
                        standards for ozone concentrations.--Not 
                        earlier than February 1, 2018, and at 10-year 
                        intervals thereafter, the committee referred to 
                        in subparagraph (A) shall, with respect to 
                        national ambient air quality standards for 
                        ozone concentrations--
                                    ``(I) complete a review of any 
                                standard promulgated under this 
                                section; and
                                    ``(II) recommend to the 
                                Administrator any new standard and any 
                                revision to the standards described in 
                                subclause (I) as may be appropriate 
                                under section 108 and subsection 
                                (b).''.
                                 <all>