There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

SOS Campus Act
Survivor Outreach and Support Campus Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require institutions of higher education to have an independent advocate for campus sexual assault prevention and response.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/11/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/11/2015 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/11/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 03/11/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/27/2015
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/05/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/10/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/17/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/17/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/11/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (13)

  • Assault and harassment offenses
  • Crime prevention
  • Crime victims
  • Crimes against women
  • Education programs funding
  • Emergency medical services and trauma care
  • Evidence and witnesses
  • Higher education
  • Medical tests and diagnostic methods
  • Right of privacy
  • School administration
  • Sex offenses

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.706. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/11/2015)

Survivor Outreach and Support Campus Act or the SOS Campus Act

Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require each institution of higher education (IHE) that participates in the programs under title IV (Student Assistance) to designate an independent advocate for campus sexual assault prevention and response (Advocate) with experience in providing sexual assault victim services.

Directs the Secretary of Education to prescribe regulations for IHEs to follow in appointing Advocates.

Requires each Advocate to: (1) report to an individual outside the body responsible for investigating and adjudicating sexual assault complaints at the IHE, (2) submit to such individual an annual report summarizing how the resources supplied to the Advocate were used, and (3) represent the interests of each student victim even when they conflict with the IHE's interests.

Directs each Advocate to:

  • ensure that sexual assault victims at the IHE receive, with their consent, specified information and services;
  • guide sexual assault victims who request assistance through the reporting, counseling, administrative, medical and health, academic accommodations, or legal processes of the IHE or local law enforcement;
  • attend, at the request of a sexual assault victim, any administrative or IHE-based adjudication proceeding related to such assault as an advocate for the victim;
  • maintain the privacy and confidentiality of the victim and any witness to such sexual assault, without notifying the IHE or any other authority of the identity of the victim or of any such witness or the alleged circumstances surrounding the reported sexual assault, unless otherwise required to do so by state law; and
  • conduct a public information campaign to inform the students enrolled at the IHE of the existence of, contact information for, and services provided by the Advocate.

Prohibits IHEs from retaliating against: (1) Advocates for representing the interests of a student victims, or (2) student victims for reporting sexual assaults to Advocates.