There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to rename the Armed Forces Reserve Center in Great Falls, Montana, the Captain John E. Moran and Captain William Wylie Galt Armed Forces Reserve Center.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-149. (TXT | PDF)
04/29/2016Signed by President.
04/20/2016Presented to President.
04/18/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 0, 1 Present (Roll no. 154).(text: CR H1776)
03/16/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1549)
03/16/2016Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1548-1549)
03/11/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
04/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-149. (TXT | PDF)
04/29/2016Signed by President.
04/20/2016SenatePresented to President.
04/18/2016-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/18/2016-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 0, 1 Present (Roll no. 154). (text: CR H1776)
04/18/2016-6:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1781-1782)
04/18/2016-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/18/2016-4:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 719.
04/18/2016-4:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1776-1777)
04/18/2016-4:42pmHouseMr. Zinke moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/21/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/17/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
03/17/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/17/2016-9:33amHouseReceived in the House.
03/16/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1549)
03/16/2016SenateSenate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1548-1549)
03/11/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 03/11/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services03/11/2015 Referred to
03/16/2016 Discharged from
House Armed Services03/17/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness03/21/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-149 (04/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the Armed Forces Reserve Center in Great Falls, Montana, as the "Captain John E. Moran and Captain William Wylie Galt Armed Forces Reserve Center."