There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance whistleblower protection for contractor and grantee employees.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-261. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/07/2016Presented to President.
12/05/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7147)
06/23/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4560-4561; text: CR S4561)
06/07/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-270.
03/18/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-261. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/07/2016SenatePresented to President.
12/05/2016-4:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2016-4:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7147)
12/05/2016-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 795.
12/05/2016-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7147-7149)
12/05/2016-4:31pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/11/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/28/2016-5:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/24/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/23/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4560-4561; text: CR S4561)
06/07/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506.
06/07/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-270.
02/10/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/18/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/09/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/18/2015 Referred to
02/10/2016 Markup by
06/07/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-270
House Oversight and Government Reform06/28/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services06/28/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness07/11/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.795. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-261 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on June 7, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill extends federal contractor whistle-blower protections to employees of: (1) personal services contractors working on defense contracts (currently, the protections apply to employees of defense contractors, subcontractors, grantees, or subgrantees); and (2) personal services contractors or subgrantees working on federal civilian contracts (currently, the protections apply to employees of civilian contractors, subcontractors, or grantees). The civilian contractor protections, which are currently in effect as a pilot program, are made permanent.

The bill extends the prohibition against reimbursement of legal fees incurred in defending against reprisal claims brought by whistle-blowers to defense and civilian subcontractors and personal services contractors.