There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Enhancing the Stature and Visibility of Medical Rehabilitation Research at the NIH Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhancing the Stature and Visibility of Medical Rehabilitation Research at the NIH Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve, coordinate, and enhance rehabilitation research at the National Institutes of Health.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/04/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/19/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
04/04/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
Action By: Senate
04/04/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/09/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/19/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/19/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/19/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/19/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/22/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/06/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/04/2016
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/10/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/19/2015 Referred to
02/09/2016 Markup by
04/04/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.800. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (04/04/2016)

Enhancing the Stature and Visibility of Medical Rehabilitation Research at the NIH Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise requirements for medical rehabilitation research.

The purpose of the National Center for Medical Rehabilitation Research (NCMRR) is revised to include coordination of research and research training.

The NCMRR must develop and periodically update a comprehensive research plan for medical rehabilitation research. Currently, this research plan is developed and updated by the Eunice Kennedy Shriver National Institute of Child Health and Human Development.

Prior to updating the research plan, the NCMRR must report on progress in achieving the goals and objectives described in the plan.

The Medical Rehabilitation Coordinating Committee must periodically host a scientific conference or workshop on medical rehabilitation research.