There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Girls Count Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Girls Count Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Girls Count Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Girls Count Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Girls Count Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of State and the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development to provide assistance to support the rights of women and girls in developing countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/12/2015Became Public Law No: 114-24. (TXT | PDF)
06/12/2015Signed by President.
06/03/2015Presented to President.
06/01/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3624-3625)
05/23/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3317-3318; text as passed Senate: CR S3317-3318)
05/21/2015Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/19/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/12/2015Became Public Law No: 114-24. (TXT | PDF)
06/12/2015Signed by President.
06/03/2015SenatePresented to President.
06/01/2015-7:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/01/2015-7:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3624-3625)
06/01/2015-7:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 802.
06/01/2015-7:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3624-3627)
06/01/2015-7:46pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/26/2015-3:14pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/26/2015-3:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/26/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3317-3318; text as passed Senate: CR S3317-3318)
05/21/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 91.
05/21/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/21/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/19/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/19/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/23/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/24/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/20/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/22/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/19/2015 Referred to
05/21/2015 Markup by
05/21/2015 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.802. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-24 (06/12/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on May 21, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Girls Count Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill states that it is U.S. policy to:

  • encourage countries to support the rule of law and ensure girls and boys of all ages are able to fully participate in society, including by providing birth certifications and other official documentation;
  • enhance training and capacity-building in key developing countries, local nongovernmental organizations, and other civil society organizations in the design, implementation, and monitoring of programs to address the needs of birth registries in countries where girls are systematically under counted; and
  • incorporate into the design, implementation, and evaluation of policies and programs measures to evaluate the impact on girls of such policies and programs.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the Secretary and the Administrator of the U.S. Agency for International Development to support:

  • programs that contribute to improved civil registration and vital statistics systems with a focus on birth registration;
  • programs that build the capacity of developing countries' national and local legal and policy frameworks to prevent discrimination against girls in gaining access to birth certificates; and
  • programs and key ministries to increase property rights, social security, home ownership, land tenure security, inheritance rights, access to education, and economic and entrepreneurial opportunities, particularly for women and girls.

Authorizes the Secretary and the Administrator to coordinate with multilateral organizations and private sector and civil society organizations to advocate for the registration and documentation of all girls and boys in developing countries.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Secretary and the Administrator to include in relevant evaluations and reports to Congress the following information:

  • a breakdown of U.S. foreign assistance beneficiaries by age, gender, marital status, location, and school enrollment status;
  • a description of how U.S. foreign assistance benefits girls; and
  • specific information on programs that address the particular needs of girls.