There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

James Zadroga 9/11 Health and Compensation Reauthorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the World Trade Center Health Program and the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/14/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
04/14/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/14/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/20/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/28/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/28/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/07/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/07/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/13/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/01/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/17/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/23/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/24/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/15/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/21/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 08/05/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/08/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/08/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/09/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/10/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/10/2015
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/10/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/10/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/10/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/10/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/16/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/16/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/16/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/16/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/16/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/16/2015
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/16/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/17/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/17/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 09/24/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/24/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/28/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/28/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/28/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/28/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/28/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/28/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/29/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/29/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 10/19/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/26/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 10/28/2015
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/28/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/03/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/03/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/09/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/09/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/17/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/03/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/14/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/15/2015
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/22/2015 06/23/2015 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/14/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.928. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/14/2015)

James Zadroga 9/11 Health and Compensation Reauthorization Act

Amends the Public Health Service Act to extend the World Trade Center (WTC) Health Program Fund indefinitely and index appropriations to the medical care component of the consumer price index for urban consumers. Makes funding available for:

  • a quality assurance program for services delivered by health care providers,
  • the WTC Program annual report,
  • WTC Health Program Steering Committees, and
  • contracts with Clinical Centers of Excellence.

Amends the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act to make individuals (or relatives of deceased individuals) who were injured or killed in the rescue and recovery efforts after the aircraft crashes of September 11, 2001, eligible for compensation under the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001.

Allows individuals to file claims for compensation under the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001 anytime after regulations are updated based on the James Zadroga 9/11 Health and Compensation Act of 2010.

Removes the cap on payments under the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001.

Adds the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund and World Trade Center Health Program Fund to the list of accounts that are not subject to budget sequestration.