There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/25/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H4761)
06/24/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4608; text as passed Senate: CR S4607)
06/24/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
06/25/2015-5:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2015-5:12pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4761)
06/25/2015-5:05pmHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4761)
06/24/2015-8:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/24/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/24/2015-7:36pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/24/2015SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4608; text as passed Senate: CR S4607)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 08/23/2019 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.19 - A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.19.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.19. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/24/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, June 25, 2015, through Friday, July 3, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Tuesday, July 7, 2015.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, June 25, 2015, through Friday, July 3, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 7, 2015.