There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force, in recognition of its superior service during World War II.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/12/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H207)
01/08/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S117; text as passed Senate: CR S110)
01/08/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
01/12/2015-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/12/2015-7:18pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H207)
01/12/2015-7:18pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H207)
01/12/2015-7:18pmHouseMrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
01/09/2015-1:40pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/09/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/09/2015-10:27amHouseReceived in the House.
01/08/2015SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S117; text as passed Senate: CR S110)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 11/17/2019 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.2 - A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force, in recognition of its superior service during World War II.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.2. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/12/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on February 3, 2015, for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the First Special Service Force in recognition of its service during World War II.