There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
05/18/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H3295)
05/18/2015Committee on House Administration discharged.(consideration: CR H3295)
04/23/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/23/2015Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2417)
02/05/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/18/2015-7:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/18/2015-7:16pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3295)
05/18/2015-7:16pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3295)
05/18/2015-7:16pmHouseMr. Walker asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H3295)
05/18/2015HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H3295)
04/27/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/27/2015-8:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/27/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/23/2015SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/23/2015SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2417)
02/05/2015SenateReferred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S841)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/05/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Rules and Administration02/05/2015 Referred to
04/23/2015 Discharged from
Committee on House Administration04/27/2015 Referred to
05/18/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.3. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on June 7, 2015, to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.