There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing concern over the disappearance of David Sneddon, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/07/2016Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/10/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
12/07/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 709.
Action By: Senate
12/07/2016Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
12/06/2016Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/10/2016Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S827)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/10/2016
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/10/2016
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 02/10/2016
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/01/2016
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/12/2016
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/11/2016
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/15/2016
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/10/2016 Referred to
12/06/2016 Markup by
12/07/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.30. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses concern about the disappearance of David Sneddon in Yunnan Province, China, in August 2004.

Directs the Department of State and the intelligence community to continue joint investigations, coordinate investigations with the governments of China, Japan, and South Korea, and solicit information from regional affairs and law enforcement experts on plausible explanations for David Sneddon's disappearance.

Encourages the State Department and the intelligence community to work with foreign governments known to have diplomatic influence with North Korea to better investigate the possibility of North Korea's involvement in David Sneddon's disappearance, and to seek his recovery.

Requests the State Department and the intelligence community to continue to work with and inform Congress and David Sneddon's family on efforts to resolve David's disappearance.