Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/12/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, February 11, 2016, through Saturday, February 20, 2016, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, February 22, 2016.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, February 12, 2016, through Tuesday, February 16, 2016, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, February 23, 2016.