There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution honoring in praise and remembrance the extraordinary life, steady leadership, and remarkable, 70-year reign of King Bhumibol Adulyadej of Thailand.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/10/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7123)
12/07/2016Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
11/30/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
12/12/2016-4:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/12/2016-3:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2016SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7123)
12/10/2016SenateS.Amdt.5174 Amendment SA 5174 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2016SenateS.Amdt.5174 Amendment SA 5174 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S7123; text: CR S7123) To make a correction.
12/10/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7123)
12/07/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 710.
12/07/2016SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
12/06/2016SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/30/2016SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6622-6623)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/30/2016
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/30/2016
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 11/30/2016
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 11/30/2016
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 11/30/2016
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 11/30/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations11/30/2016 Referred to
12/06/2016 Markup by
12/07/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.57. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/10/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the life, leadership, and 70-year reign of His Majesty King Bhumibol Adulyadej of Thailand.

Celebrates the alliance and friendship between Thailand and the United States that reflects common interests, a 183-year diplomatic history, and a multifaceted partnership that has contributed to peace, stability, and prosperity in the Asia-Pacific region.