There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Corps of Engineers and the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/20/2016Vetoed by President.
01/19/2016Presented to President.
01/13/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 253 - 166 (Roll no. 45).(text: CR H335)
11/04/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 297.(text: CR S7743)
10/30/2015Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).(consideration: CR S7675; text: CR S7675)
09/17/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/21/2016SenateVeto message indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S147)
01/21/2016SenateCloture on the veto message not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 40. Record Vote Number: 5. (consideration: CR S146-147; text: CR S146)
01/21/2016SenateVeto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S143-147)
01/20/2016Vetoed by President.
01/20/2016SenateCloture motion on the veto message presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S111-112; text: CR S111)
01/20/2016SenateVeto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S100, S111-112)
01/20/2016SenateVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk.
01/19/2016SenatePresented to President.
01/13/2016-11:55amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/13/2016-11:55amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 253 - 166 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H335)
01/13/2016-11:48amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H355-356)
01/13/2016-10:23amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J.Res. 22, the Chair put the question on passage, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Gibbs demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
01/13/2016-10:23amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H346)
01/13/2016-9:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 22.
01/13/2016-9:15amHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1644, S.J. Res. 22 and H.R. 3662. The resolution also provides for proceedings during the period from January 14, 2016, through January 22, 2016.
01/13/2016-9:15amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 583. (consideration: CR H335-346)
01/11/2016-6:50pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 583 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1644, S.J. Res. 22 and H.R. 3662. The resolution also provides for proceedings during the period from January 14, 2016, through January 22, 2016.
11/16/2015-9:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/16/2015-2:10pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/05/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/04/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 297. (text: CR S7743)
11/04/2015SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S7703-7715, S7735-7743)
11/03/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S7703)
11/03/2015SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 296.
10/30/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
10/30/2015SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). (consideration: CR S7675; text: CR S7675)
09/17/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 09/17/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 09/17/2015
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/17/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 09/21/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/24/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/07/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works09/17/2015 Referred to
10/30/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.22. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/13/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act and published on June 29, 2015.