There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of a rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Standards of Performance for Greenhouse Gas Emissions from New, Modified, and Reconstructed Stationary Sources: Electric Utility Generating Units".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2015Vetoed by President.
12/18/2015Presented to President.
12/01/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 188 (Roll no. 651).(text: CR H8658)
11/17/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 46. Record Vote Number: 307.(text: CR S8012)
11/16/2015Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).(consideration: CR S7965; text: CR S7965)
10/26/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/11/2016SenateVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text of veto message: CR 01/11/2016 S28-29)
12/18/2015Vetoed by President.
12/18/2015SenatePresented to President.
12/01/2015-5:25pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 188 (Roll no. 651). (text: CR H8658)
12/01/2015-5:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/01/2015-5:17pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8676-8678, H8822-8829, H8837-8838)
12/01/2015-3:39pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J. Res. 23, the Chair put the question on adoption of the resolution, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Tonko demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the resolution until later in the legislative day.
12/01/2015-3:38pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H8663)
12/01/2015-2:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 23.
12/01/2015-2:35pmHouseResolution provides for one hour of general debate only on H.R. 8; resolution provides for one hour of general debate on S.J. Res. 23 and S.J. Res. 24 as well as one motion to commit on each joint resolution.
12/01/2015-2:35pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 539. (consideration: CR H8658-8663)
11/30/2015-6:48pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 539 Reported to House. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate only on H.R. 8; resolution provides for one hour of general debate on S.J. Res. 23 and S.J. Res. 24 as well as one motion to commit on each joint resolution.
11/18/2015-1:27pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/18/2015-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/18/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/17/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 46. Record Vote Number: 307. (text: CR S8012)
11/17/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S8012)
11/17/2015SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/17/2015SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S8012)
11/16/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 293.
11/16/2015SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). (consideration: CR S7965; text: CR S7965)
10/26/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7492)

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 10/26/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 10/26/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 10/26/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works10/26/2015 Referred to
11/16/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/01/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency's rule published on October 23, 2015, that establishes new source performance standards under the Clean Air Act for carbon dioxide emissions from fossil fuel-fired electric utility generating units (EGUs) if the EGUs are newly constructed, modified, or reconstructed. (Those EGUs convert fossil fuel energy to electric energy.)