There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of Agriculture relating to inspection of fish of the order Siluriformes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/25/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 86.(text: CR S3135)
05/23/2016Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).(consideration: CR S3053; text: CR S3053)
12/10/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/26/2016-1:08pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/26/2016-11:56amHouseReceived in the House.
05/26/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/25/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 86. (text: CR S3135)
05/25/2016SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3131-3135)
05/24/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S3084-3091)
05/24/2016SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 40. Record Vote Number: 85. (consideration: CR S3084)
05/24/2016SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S3084; text: CR S3084)
05/23/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 479.
05/23/2016SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). (consideration: CR S3053; text: CR S3053)
12/10/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Cosponsors (22)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry12/10/2015 Referred to
05/23/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/25/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution disapproves and nullifies a Department of Agriculture rule published on December 2, 2015, to establish a mandatory inspection program for fish of the order Siluriformes, including catfish and products derived from the fish.