There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to the definition of the term "fiduciary" and the conflict of interest rule with respect to retirement investment advice.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/18/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/18/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 04/18/2016
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 04/18/2016
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 04/19/2016
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/19/2016
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/20/2016
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/20/2016
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/25/2016
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/26/2016
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/2016
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/18/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.33. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/18/2016)

This joint resolution disapproves and nullifies a Department of Labor rule published on April 8, 2016, relating to the definition of the term "fiduciary" and the conflict of interest rule with respect to retirement investment advice.

(The rule defines who is a fiduciary with respect to pension and retirement plans. Under current law, a person who provides investment advice has a fiduciary obligation that requires the person to provide advice in the sole interest of plan participants and beneficiaries. The rule changes the definition of "investment advice" to treat people who provide investment advice to pension and retirement plans for a fee or other compensation as fiduciaries in a wider array of advice relationships.)