There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/21/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/21/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/21/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 01/22/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/22/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/26/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 02/12/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/02/2015
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/06/2016
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/13/2016
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.5. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/21/2015)

Constitutional Amendment

Authorizes Congress and the states to set reasonable limits on the raising and spending of money by candidates and others to influence elections.

Grants Congress and the states the power to implement and enforce this amendment by appropriate legislation. Allows them to distinguish between natural persons and corporations or other artificial entities created by law, including by prohibiting such entities from spending money to influence elections.

Declares that nothing in this amendment shall be construed to grant Congress or the states the power to abridge the freedom of the press.