Committees: H.R.10 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services04/26/2017 Referred to
04/26/2017 Hearings by
05/04/2017 Markup by
06/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-153,Part 1 Book 1
H. Rept. 115-153,Part 1 Book 2
H. Rept. 115-153,Part 2
House Agriculture04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit05/04/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Judiciary04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management04/27/2017 Referred to
House Rules04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Budget04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce04/26/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/13/2017 Referred to
07/13/2017 Hearings by