There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the provision of adult day health care services for veterans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4468)
05/23/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-148.
02/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/23/2017-3:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2017-3:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4468)
05/23/2017-3:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1005.
05/23/2017-3:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4468-4469)
05/23/2017-3:18pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/23/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 96.
05/23/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-148.
05/17/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 02/16/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/16/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/16/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/16/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/21/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/21/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/27/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/02/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/02/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/09/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/09/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/09/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/09/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/09/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/09/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/10/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/16/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/16/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/16/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/21/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/21/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/21/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/22/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/22/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/23/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/05/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/25/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/25/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/16/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/16/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/18/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs02/13/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-148
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Hearings by
04/06/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/23/2017)

This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement or a contract with each state home to pay for adult day health care for a veteran eligible for, but not receiving, nursing home care.

The veteran must need such care specifically for a service-connected disability or the veteran must have a service-connected disability rated 70% or more.

Payment under each agreement or contract between the VA and a state home must equal 65% of the payment that the VA would otherwise pay to the state home if the veteran were receiving nursing home care. Such payment constitutes full payment to the state home for such care.