There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Employees Paid Parental Leave Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that 6 of the 12 weeks of parental leave made available to a Federal employee shall be paid leave, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/13/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E180)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/13/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/15/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/15/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/15/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/15/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/15/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/16/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/28/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/09/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/09/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/17/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/17/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 03/17/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/17/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/17/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/23/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/30/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/03/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/03/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/03/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/28/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/28/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/02/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/13/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/29/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/11/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/16/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/07/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/07/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/20/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/28/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/03/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/04/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/13/2017 Referred to
House Administration02/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1022. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2017)

Federal Employees Paid Parental Leave Act of 2017

This bill allows federal employees to substitute any available paid leave for any leave without pay for either the birth of a child or the placement of a child for adoption or foster care. It makes available for any of the 12 weeks of leave an employee is entitled to for such purposes: (1) six administrative weeks of paid parental leave in connection with the birth or placement involved, and (2) any accumulated annual or sick leave.

The Office of Personnel Management may promulgate regulations to increase the amount of paid parental leave available to such an employee to a total of 12 administrative workweeks. Such regulations must consider certain factors, including benefit and cost to the federal government.

The bill amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 and the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 to allow the same substitution for covered congressional employees, Government Accountability Office (GAO) employees, and Library of Congress employees. Service in the National Guard or the Reserves by employees of the executive branch, Congress, the GAO, or the Library of Congress shall count as service for purposes of determining eligibility to take or substitute leave as allowed under this bill.