There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the National Emergency Medical Services Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-275. (TXT | PDF)
11/03/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018Presented to President.
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6875)
07/18/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 338).
05/11/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-669.
02/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-275. (TXT | PDF)
11/03/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018HousePresented to President.
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6875)
07/19/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
07/18/2018-3:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/18/2018-3:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 338).
07/18/2018-3:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6495-6496)
07/17/2018-6:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/17/2018-5:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1037.
07/17/2018-5:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6338-6339; text: CR H6338)
07/17/2018-5:56pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/11/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
05/11/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-669.
04/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/18/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
04/11/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
02/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/14/2017 Referred to
04/18/2018 Markup by
05/11/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-669
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/24/2017 Referred to
04/11/2018 Hearings by
04/18/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1037. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-275 (11/03/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the National Emergency Medical Services Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work on federal land in the District of Columbia and its environs to commemorate the commitment and service represented by emergency medical services.

The bill: (1) prohibits the use of federal funds to pay any expense of the establishment of such work; (2) makes the foundation solely responsible for acceptance of contributions for, and payment of the expenses of, the establishment of such work; and (3) provides for the deposit of excess funds received for such work into a National Park Foundation account.