There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to prohibit prescription drug plan sponsors and MA-PD organizations under the Medicare program from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/09/2017 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E306)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/17/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2017 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/15/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/15/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/15/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/16/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/01/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/02/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 03/09/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/10/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/20/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/23/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/28/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/03/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/27/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/27/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/27/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/16/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/16/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/24/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 06/02/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/06/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/18/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/05/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/14/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/17/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/14/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/24/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (3)

  • Medicare
  • Prescription drugs

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1038. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2017)

Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit Medicare Prescription Drug Plan sponsors from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies. (A "clean claim" is a Medicare claim that is free of defects such as incomplete documentation.)