There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Recreational Lands Self-Defense Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the right of individuals to bear arms at water resources development projects administered by the Secretary of the Army, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/14/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 02/14/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/14/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 02/14/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/09/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/09/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/09/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/09/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/24/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/22/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/23/2017
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 09/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/15/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1045.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1045. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2017)

Recreational Lands Self-Defense Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the Army Corps of Engineers from promulgating or enforcing any regulation that prohibits an individual from possessing a firearm at a water resources development project administered by the Corps of Engineers if: (1) the individual is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing the firearm, and (2) the possession of the firearm is in compliance with the law of the state in which the project is located.