There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enable concrete masonry products manufacturers to establish, finance, and carry out a coordinated program of research, education, and promotion to improve, maintain, and develop markets for concrete masonry products.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/14/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/09/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/09/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/09/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/09/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/16/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/22/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/27/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/11/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/24/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/24/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/07/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/12/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/13/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/27/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/17/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/19/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/03/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/03/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/06/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/10/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/10/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/10/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/12/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/23/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/23/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/23/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/26/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/26/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/26/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/31/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 10/31/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/02/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/02/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/02/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 11/02/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/09/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/09/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/05/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/02/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/10/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2017 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection02/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1046. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2017)

Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of Commerce to issue orders applicable to U.S. manufacturers of concrete masonry products. Any such order must provide for the establishment of a Concrete Masonry Products Board to carry out a program of generic promotion, research, and education regarding concrete masonry products.

An order must also provide that assessments be paid by concrete masonry product manufacturers for concrete masonry products manufactured and marketed in the United States. At least 50% of the assessments paid by a manufacturer must be used to support research, education, and generic promotion programs and projects in support of the geographic region of the manufacturer.

During the 60-day period preceding the proposed effective date of an order, Commerce shall conduct a referendum for order approval among manufacturers.

The bill allows petition and review of an order, and order enforcement through U.S. district courts.

The bill requires a study and a report by: (1) the Government Accountability Office on how the board spends assessments collected, the impact of board activities, and other matters relating to the demand for concrete masonry products; and (2) Commerce on the appropriateness and effectiveness of applying the commodity check-off program model to a nonagricultural industry.