There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote botanical research and botanical sciences capacity, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
03/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/15/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/15/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2017 Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/14/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/23/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture02/14/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry02/24/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services02/14/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness03/23/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/15/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit02/15/2017 Referred to
House Administration02/14/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 12/11/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1054 - Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act.

Subjects (21)

  • Animal and plant health
  • Biological and life sciences
  • Building construction
  • Department of the Interior
  • Ecology
  • Endangered and threatened species
  • Fires
  • Forests, forestry, trees
  • Genetics
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Higher education
  • Horticulture and plants
  • Land use and conservation
  • Military facilities and property
  • Public-private cooperation
  • Research administration and funding
  • Roads and highways
  • Student aid and college costs
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1054. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2017)

Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act

This bill directs the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), the U.S. Geological Survey, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (USFWS), the National Park Service, and other appropriate entities to support a program of intramural and extramural botanical science research to support the land management responsibilities of the Department of the Interior. Interior may hire additional personnel to augment its expertise in the botanical sciences.

Interior's land management agencies, the Forest Service, and the Department of Defense shall give preference to using locally adapted native plant materials when undertaking land management activities on lands under their respective jurisdictions.

A state shall maximize the use of such plant materials when carrying out environmental mitigation efforts and environmental restoration and pollution abatement activities authorized under the surface transportation block grant program.

Sponsors of development or redevelopment projects involving certain federal facilities shall establish, maintain, or restore use of such plant materials on all natural spaces.

Specified federal agencies shall collaborate regarding land use responsibility when undertaking specified activities related to native plant materials.

The bill authorizes the BLM to undertake specified activities for the development and use of native plant materials.

The National Fish and Wildlife Foundation shall ensure that a program of activities which is focused on conservation and protection of native plants is incorporated into its existing programs and activities.

The USFWS shall support a program of collaborative grants to: (1) prevent rare plants from becoming endangered, and (2) encourage the recovery of endangered plants.