There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
03/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: House Armed Services
02/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: House Agriculture
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/23/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/15/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/15/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2017 Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To promote botanical research and botanical sciences capacity, and for other purposes.


Subjects (21)

  • Animal and plant health
  • Biological and life sciences
  • Building construction
  • Department of the Interior
  • Ecology
  • Endangered and threatened species
  • Fires
  • Forests, forestry, trees
  • Genetics
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Higher education
  • Horticulture and plants
  • Land use and conservation
  • Military facilities and property
  • Public-private cooperation
  • Research administration and funding
  • Roads and highways
  • Student aid and college costs
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/14/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/23/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/23/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture02/14/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry02/24/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services02/14/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness03/23/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/15/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit02/15/2017 Referred to
House Administration02/14/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 05/28/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1054 - Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act.