There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish a structure for visitor services on the Arlington Ridge tract, in the area of the U.S. Marine Corps War Memorial, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/27/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5206)
05/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-113.
02/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/28/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/27/2017-2:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2017-2:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5206)
06/27/2017-2:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1073.
06/27/2017-2:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5206-5207)
06/27/2017-2:24pmHouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 67.
05/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-113.
04/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
04/27/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 04/27/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/15/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
05/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-113
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/24/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/28/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1073.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1073. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/27/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to construct on the Arlington Ridge tract in the area of the U.S. Marine Corps War Memorial in Arlington County, Virginia, a structure for visitor services, including a public restroom facility.