There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Act entitled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of Iowa over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Sac and Fox Indian Reservation".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-301. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018Presented to President.
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7141)
11/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8323)
08/29/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-279.
02/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-301. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018HousePresented to President.
11/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/27/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018SenateSenate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7141)
11/02/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
11/01/2017-2:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/01/2017-2:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8323)
11/01/2017-2:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1074.
11/01/2017-2:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8323-8324)
11/01/2017-2:44pmHouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/29/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199.
08/29/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-279.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/07/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
02/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/15/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/15/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/15/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
08/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-279
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/24/2017 Referred to
06/07/2017 Hearings by
Senate Indian Affairs11/02/2017 Referred to
11/27/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1074. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-301 (12/11/2018)

This bill repeals the act titled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of Iowa over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Sac and Fox Indian Reservation."