Text: H.R.1090 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1090


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the credit for residential energy efficient property and the energy credit.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 15, 2017

Mr. Reed (for himself, Mr. Meehan, Mr. Thompson of California, Mr. Blumenauer, Mr. Faso, Mr. Larson of Connecticut, Mr. Tonko, Mr. Pocan, Mr. Cárdenas, Mr. Rokita, Mr. Mullin, Mr. Kind, Mr. Cole, Mrs. Love, Mr. Reichert, Mr. LoBiondo, Mr. Blum, Mr. Curbelo of Florida, Mr. Young of Iowa, and Mr. Costello of Pennsylvania) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the credit for residential energy efficient property and the energy credit.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Technologies for Energy Security Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Extension and phaseout of residential energy efficient property.

(a) Extension.—Section 25D(h) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “December 31, 2016 (December 31, 2021, in the case of any qualified solar electric property expenditures and qualified solar water heating property expenditures)” and inserting “December 31, 2021”.

(b) Phaseout.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Paragraphs (3), (4), and (5) of section 25D(a) of such Code are amended by striking “30 percent” each place it appears and inserting “the applicable percentage”.

(2) CONFORMING AMENDMENT.—Section 25D(g) of such Code is amended by striking “paragraphs (1) and (2) of”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect on the date of the enactment of this Act.

SEC. 3. Extension of energy credit.

(a) Solar energy property.—Paragraph (3)(A)(ii) of section 48(a) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “periods ending before January 1, 2017” and inserting “property the construction of which begins before January 1, 2022”.

(b) Qualified fuel cell property.—Section 48(c)(1)(D) of such Code is amended by striking “for any period after December 31, 2016” and inserting “the construction of which does not begin before January 1, 2022”.

(c) Qualified microturbine property.—Section 48(c)(2)(D) of such Code is amended by striking “for any period after December 31, 2016” and inserting “the construction of which does not begin before January 1, 2022”.

(d) Combined heat and power system property.—Section 48(c)(3)(A)(iv) of such Code is amended by striking “which is placed in service before January 1, 2017” and inserting “the construction of which begins before January 1, 2022”.

(e) Qualified small wind energy property.—Section 48(c)(4)(C) of such Code is amended by striking “for any period after December 31, 2016” and inserting “the construction of which does not begin before January 1, 2022”.

(f) Thermal energy property.—Section 48(a)(3)(A)(vii) of such Code is amended by striking “periods ending before January 1, 2017” and inserting “property the construction of which begins before January 1, 2022”.

(g) Phaseout of 30 percent credit rate for fuel cell and small wind energy property.—Subsection (a) of section 48 of such Code is amended by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(7) PHASEOUT FOR QUALIFIED FUEL CELL PROPERTY AND QUALIFIED SMALL WIND ENERGY PROPERTY.—In the case of qualified fuel cell property or qualified small wind energy property, the construction of which begins before January 1, 2022, the energy percentage determined under paragraph (2) shall be equal to—

“(A) in the case of any property the construction of which begins after December 31, 2019, and before January 1, 2021, 26 percent, and

“(B) in the case of any property the construction of which begins after December 31, 2020, and before January 1, 2022, 22 per-cent.”.

(h) Phaseout for Fiber-Optic Solar Energy Property.—Section 48(a)(6) of such Code is amended by inserting “or (3)(A)(ii)” after “paragraph (3)(A)(i)”.

(i) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect on the date of the enactment of this Act.