There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Weekend Voting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To change the date for regularly scheduled general elections for Federal office to the first Saturday and Sunday after the first Friday in November in every even-numbered year.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/24/2018-10:35amASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Brendan F. Boyle (PA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be the first sponsor of H.R. 1094, a bill originally introduced by Representative Slaughter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/15/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/16/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/16/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/27/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/27/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/02/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/02/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/07/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/07/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/07/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/07/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/08/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/09/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/09/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/13/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/04/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/26/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/08/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/20/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/20/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/20/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/20/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/20/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/22/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/22/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/22/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/26/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/26/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/27/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/28/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/28/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/10/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/11/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/20/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/02/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/04/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/16/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/16/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/16/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/24/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/24/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/24/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/24/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/31/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/07/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/15/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2017)

Weekend Voting Act

This bill amends the Revised Statutes of the United States to change the timing for regularly scheduled elections for the House of Representatives, Senate, and electors of the President and Vice President to the first Saturday and Sunday after the first Friday in November.

Each state shall by law establish the hours of operation for polling places.

This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the holding of elections over a weekend should be carried out in a manner which does not interfere with religious practices and should result in cost savings to the taxpayer.