There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Redistricting Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require States to conduct Congressional redistricting through independent commissions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/16/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/16/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/01/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/04/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/20/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/28/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/13/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/18/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/23/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/26/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/11/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/11/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/18/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/25/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/26/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/26/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/12/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/20/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/23/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/16/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice03/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1102. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Redistricting Reform Act of 2017

This bill prohibits a state that has been redistricted after an apportionment of Members of the House of Representatives based on the results of the census from being redistricted again until after the next apportionment, unless the state is ordered by a court to conduct redistricting in order to comply with the Constitution or the Voting Rights Act of 1965.

Redistricting must be conducted in accordance with a plan established by a state independent redistricting commission or, if such a plan is not established, in accordance with a redistricting plan established by a three-judge panel of the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia.

This bill sets forth provisions relating to: (1) the establishment and procedures of state independent redistricting commissions, including requirements for commissions to hold their meetings in public and maintain a public website; (2) the development and publication of preliminary redistricting plans; (3) the establishment of a redistricting plan by a three-judge panel and redistricting conducted under a federal court order; and (4) Election Assistance Commission payments to states for carrying out redistricting.

This bill authorizes the Department of Justice to bring a civil action to enforce this bill. The action must be given expedited consideration.