There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SPARC Act
Secondary Payer Advancement, Rationalization, and Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for clarification and rationalization of Medicare prescription drug plan recovery rules for certain claims.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/16/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/21/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/27/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/11/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/16/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/17/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/16/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/01/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1122.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1122. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Secondary Payer Advancement, Rationalization, and Clarification Act or the SPARC Act

This bill specifies recovery rules and timelines with respect to secondary claims responsibility under the Medicare prescription drug benefit. Current law specifies only that secondary payor provisions apply under the benefit in the same manner as they apply with respect to Medicare Advantage plans.