There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide for an operation on a live donor for purposes of conducting a transplant procedure for a veteran, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide for an operation on a live donor for purposes of conducting a transplant procedure for a veteran, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8553)
11/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-393.
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8553)
11/07/2017-3:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1133.
11/07/2017-3:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8553-8554)
11/07/2017-3:04pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 289.
11/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-393.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/16/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/28/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/28/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/13/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/13/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/13/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/13/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/13/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/13/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 05/24/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/20/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/03/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 10/03/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/04/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/11/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/11/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 10/19/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 10/19/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 10/23/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/23/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/23/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/25/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/01/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/16/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-393
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1133. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/07/2017)

Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to authorize the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) provide for an operation on a live donor to carry out a transplant procedure for an eligible veteran, notwithstanding that the live donor may not be eligible for VA health care, and (2) provide for such an operation at a VA facility or a non-VA facility that has an agreement with the VA. (The live donor shall be deemed to be an individual eligible for hospital care and medical services at a non-VA facility pursuant to such an agreement solely for the purposes of receiving such operation, care, and services.)

Subject to fund availability, the VA shall furnish to such a donor any care or services that may be required before and after conducting such procedure.