There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FDA Deeming Authority Clarification Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to provide for a certain effective date with respect to deemed tobacco products, to provide for the establishment of product standards for vapor product batteries, to provide for regulation of vapor products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/07/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/07/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/08/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/08/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/08/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/09/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/09/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/09/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 03/09/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/13/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/13/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/13/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 03/16/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/16/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/17/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/17/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/17/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 03/20/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 03/20/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/22/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/22/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/22/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/23/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/23/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/23/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/27/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/27/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/03/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/03/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 04/03/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/03/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/04/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/20/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/20/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/20/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/20/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/20/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/20/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/27/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/27/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/02/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 05/02/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/02/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/15/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/15/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/15/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/15/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/26/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/26/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/26/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/26/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 05/26/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/26/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/14/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/20/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/12/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/12/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/24/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/24/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/25/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/28/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/28/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 08/01/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 10/04/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/07/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 11/15/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 12/01/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/22/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/10/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/16/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/17/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1136.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1136. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

FDA Deeming Authority Clarification Act of 2017

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (FFDCA) to: (1) revise premarket review and reporting requirements for products newly deemed by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to be tobacco products; and (2) grant the FDA the authority to regulate vapor products, which include products that produce vapor with nicotine (e.g., e-cigarettes) and nicotine intended to be used with such a product (e.g., nicotine cartridges).

A product is not subject to premarket review by the FDA if it is marketed before it is deemed a tobacco product.

The bill delays deadlines for reports to the FDA on products similar to a marketed product that are introduced to market less than 21 months after that type of product is deemed a tobacco product.

The bill grants the FDA regulatory authority over vapor products that is in addition to the FDA's existing authority to regulate vapor products as tobacco products.

Provisions of the FFDCA applicable to tobacco product components also apply to vapor product batteries. The FDA must establish standards for vapor product batteries. Vapor products first marketed not later than 24 months after enactment of this bill are not subject to premarket review or reporting requirements based on changes to the product's battery to conform to standards.

Vapor products may not be advertised in publications, except publications with adult readership.

Vapor products may be sold only face-to-face, through vending machines in facilities where only adults are permitted, or by mail order.

Vapor products must be labeled with their nicotine content and specified phrases.

Retailers of vapor products must register with the FDA.